EP0628935 - Portable object authentication method by an off-line terminal, corresponding portable object and terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL CP8 68 route de Versailles, B.P. 45 78430 Louveciennes / FR | [1998/21] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states BULL CP8 68 route de Versailles, B.P. 45 F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patarin, Jacques 11, rue Amédée Dailly F-78220 Viroflay / FR | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Corlu, Bernard Edouard, et al CP8 Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 36-38 rue de la Princesse BP 45 78431 Louveciennes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Corlu, Bernard, et al 68, route de Versailles, PC/59C18 F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401209.5 | 02.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | FR19930006855 | 08.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9306855 | [1994/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628935 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628935 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
G07F7/1016 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,KR,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beglaubigen eines tragbaren Objektes mittels eines off-line Terminals, entsprechendes, tragbares Objekt und entsprechendes Terminal | [1994/50] | English: | Portable object authentication method by an off-line terminal, corresponding portable object and terminal | [1994/50] | French: | Procédé d'authentification d'un objet portatif par un terminal hors ligne, objet portatif et terminal correspondants | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.05.1998 | GR | 20.05.1998 | [2000/05] |
Former [1999/01] | AT | 20.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0096599 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]) [A] 1,8 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 14 *; | [YA]EP0231702 (BULL CP8 [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 3; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 8; | [A]EP0284133 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR], et al) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claim 1 * | [YA] - HANS-PETER KÖNIGS, "CRYPTOGRAPHIC IDENTIFICATION METHODS FOR SMART CARDS IN THE PROCESS OF STANDARDIZATION", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, PISCATAWAY,N.J.,US, (199106), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 42 - 48 [Y] 1 * page 43, paragraph 2 - page 46, paragraph L; figures 2,3 * [A] 8 |