EP0636728 - Process for manufacturing a glass mat with filaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VETROTEX FRANCE 130, avenue des Follaz 73000 Chambéry / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states VETROTEX FRANCE 130, avenue des Follaz F-73000 Chambéry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moireau, Patrick Lieu dit "Le Vernay" F-73190 Curienne / FR | 02 /
Droux, Michel 7, rue de l'Hélia F-73490 La Ravoire / FR | 03 /
Duchamp, Fabrice 32, Le Praz du Nant F-73000 Chambery / FR | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Breton, Jean-Claude, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401678.1 | 21.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | FR19930009321 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309321 | [1995/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636728 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636728 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/03, D04H1/64 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
D04H3/004 (EP);
D04H3/03 (EP);
D04H3/105 (EP);
D04H3/12 (EP);
D04H3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Glasfasermatte aus Filamenten | [1998/06] | English: | Process for manufacturing a glass mat with filaments | [1995/05] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de mats de verre à fils continus | [1995/05] |
Former [1995/05] | Verfahren zur Herstellung glas Matte aus Filament | Examination procedure | 03.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 11.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0243275 (VETROTEX) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 10; | [YA]EP0142463 (CIBA-GEIGY) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,4,7; | [A]EP0114345 (WESTERN ELECTRIC) [A] 1,4,7,8 * claim - *; | [A]WO8400424 (DESOTO) [A] 2,3,5,6 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US4660927 (KIYOHIRO KONDOW) [A] 1,2,4 * claim - *; | [A]EP0431439 (UBE-NITTO) [A] 3,6,9 * abstract * |