EP0645309 - Method and apparatus for adapting the height of a package to the height of its contents and cutting device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savoye Nouvelle Société Anonyme dite SAVOYE N.S.A. F-21550 Ladoix Serrigny / FR | [1995/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ortmans, Thierry 6, rue Julie Godenet F-21700 Nuits-Saint-Georges / FR | 02 /
de Barbuat, Charles Antoine 4, rue Notre Dame F-21700 Nuits-Saint-Georges / FR | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Cabinet Martinet & Lapoux BP 405 F-78055 Saint Quentin en Yvelines Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94401939.7 | 31.08.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | FR19930011606 | 29.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311606 | [1995/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645309 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645309 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/00, B65B59/00 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
B65B61/00 (EP,US);
B65B59/001 (EP,US);
B65B59/003 (EP,US);
B65B2210/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL [1995/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Anpassung der Höhe einer Verpackung an die Höhe ihres Inhalts und Schneidevorrichtung dafür | [1995/13] | English: | Method and apparatus for adapting the height of a package to the height of its contents and cutting device therefor | [1995/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour adapter la hauteur d'un emballage à la hauteur de son contenu et dispositif de coupe pour la mise en oeuvre | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US3953956 (MASSMAN BURL) [XD] 1,2,5 * column 9, line 48 - column 10, line 44; figures 3,4,11 * [A] 13; | [A]GB2126558 (FOCKE & CO); | [XDA]FR2560581 (SOCAR [FR]) [XD] 1,2,4 [A] 13 | by applicant | GB1321976 | US3953956 | FR2426620 | FR2506722 | FR2426620 | EP0151364 | FR2560581 | FR2564068 | FR2558792 | FR2590548 | FR2604654 | EP0225208 | EP0236173 |