EP0643399 - High frequency transmission cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states ALCATEL ALSTHOM COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'ELECTRICITE 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states FILOTEX 140/146 rue Eugène Delacroix F-91210 Draveil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rofidal, Patrick 140, Rue Jules Guesde F-08170 Fumay / FR | 02 /
Damilo, Serge 22, Rue d'Aubilly Charleville Mezieres / FR | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Buffiere, Michelle, et al Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Buffiere, Michelle, et al SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402005.6 | 08.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | FR19930010732 | 09.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9310732 | [1995/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643399 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643399 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/18, H01B11/02 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
H01B11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | Hochfrequenzübertragungskabel | [1995/11] | English: | High frequency transmission cable | [1995/11] | French: | Cable de transmission haute fréquence | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 29.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.02.1998 | DK | 25.05.1998 | BE | 30.09.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 25.02.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 30.09.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1665605 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-5* page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3405852 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * page 7, paragraph L; figure 2 *; | [A]US4674822 (HALL CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 10; figures 4,5 * | Examination | US4755629 |