EP0642775 - Intervertebral disc prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6) 4, Place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE PARIS VI 4, place Jussieu 75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR | |||
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE PARIS VI 4, place Jussieu F-75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bainville, Daniel 65, rue du Petit Bois F-37550 St Avertin / FR | 02 /
Laval, François 8, Avenue Joliot Curie F-37260 Monts / FR | 03 /
Roy-Camille, Raymond 1, rue Buenos Aires F-75007 Paris / FR | 04 /
Saillant, Gérard 8, Sente des Bruyères F-78170 La Celle St Cloud / FR | 05 /
Lavaste, François 32, Allée des Cèdres F-91240 St Michel sur Orge / FR | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/11] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402024.7 | 12.09.1994 | [1995/11] | Priority number, date | FR19930010917 | 14.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9310917 | [1995/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642775 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642775 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/443 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1995/11] | Title | German: | Bandscheibenprothese | [1995/11] | English: | Intervertebral disc prosthesis | [1995/11] | French: | Prothèse de disque intervertébral | [1995/11] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/42] | 11.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2263842 (HOFFMANN DAIMLER SIEGFRIED DR) [Y] 1 * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 6; figures 5,7,8 * [A] 2,3; | [YA]EP0356112 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON ORTHOPAEDICS [US], et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 2,3; | [YA]EP0346269 (MECRON MED PROD GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 31 - line 43; figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 5,6; | [A]US4874389 (DOWNEY ERNEST L [US]) [A] 1,4 * figure 4 *; | [DA]EP0277282 (SULZER AG [CH]) [DA] 1,5,6 * figure 1; claims 1,4 *; | [A]DE9000094U (MECRON MEDIZINISCHE PRODUKTE GMBH) [A] 1,5,6 * figure .; claims 1,6,7 * |