EP0645804 - Metal casing for semiconductor device having high thermal conductivity and thermal expansion coefficient similar to that of semiconductor and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsujioka, Masanori, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-Chome Itami-Shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Junzoh, c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Koyakita 1-Chome Itami-Shi, Hyogo / JP | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phelip 21 rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402072.6 | 16.09.1994 | [1995/13] | Priority number, date | JP19930253818 | 16.09.1993 Original published format: JP 25381893 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0645804 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0645804 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | [1996/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645804 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, H01L23/14 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
H01L31/0203 (EP,US);
H01L21/4817 (EP,US);
H01L23/045 (EP,US);
H01L23/047 (EP,US);
H01L23/06 (EP,US);
H01S5/02216 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01S5/02469 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/13] | H01L21/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | Metallgehäuse für Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1995/13] | English: | Metal casing for semiconductor device having high thermal conductivity and thermal expansion coefficient similar to that of semiconductor and method for manufacturing the same | [1995/13] | French: | Boîtier métallique pour dispositif à semi-conducteur et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 26.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02023598.2 / EP1282166 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5167697 (KOUMURA TAKESHIE [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 53 - line 61 * * column 5, line 11 - line 50 * * column 6, line 50 - line 60 * * column 7, line 25 - line 34 *; | [X]EP0100232 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 25; tables 1,3 *; | [D]JPS5921032 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [AD]WO8902803 (FINE PARTICLE TECHN CORP [US]) [AD] 1,3 * page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 9 *; | [YA]JPS59143347 ; | [Y]US4710223 (MATEJCZYK DANIEL E [US]) [Y] 7-11,13,14 * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 17 *; | [A]JPH05222402 ; | [AP]US5342573 (AMANO YOSHINARI [JP], et al) [AP] * claim 7 *; | [A]JPS58117261 ; | [A]DE2137829 (INSTITUTUL DE CERCETARI METALURGICE ICEM) [A] 7 * claim . *; | [A]DE2820974 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD) [A] 7 * claim 1 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841213), vol. 008, no. 272, Database accession no. (E - 284), & JP59143347 A 19840816 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO KK) [Y] 7-11,13,14 * abstract * [A] 1-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931209), vol. 017, no. 667, Database accession no. (M - 1524), & JP05222402 A 19930831 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 11 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 33, Database accession no. 83-738929, & JPS58117261 A 19830712 (MIZUYA T) [A] 12 * abstract * |