EP0644558 - Câble insulative structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/48] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses F-92100 Clichy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prigent, Madeleine 10 Allee des fraises 1460 Marcoussis / FR | 02 /
Janah, Hakim 8 Rue du sémaphore F-62100 Sangatte / FR | 03 /
Gadessaud, Robert 25 Rue de La Collégiale F-75005 Paris / FR | 04 /
Bezille, José 32 Rue des Poilus F-59240 Dunkerque / FR | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/15] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/12] | Laroche, Danièle, et al c/o SOSPI 14-16 rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402087.4 | 20.09.1994 | [1995/12] | Priority number, date | FR19930011234 | 21.09.1993 Original published format: FR 9311234 | [1995/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644558 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644558 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/22] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0644558 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/02 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
H01B9/02 (KR);
H01B9/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | Kabelisolierstruktur | [1995/12] | English: | Câble insulative structure | [1995/12] | French: | Structure d'isolement pour câble | [1995/12] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 DK - 2800 LYNGBY / DK Opponent's representative Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.03.2000
ADMISSIBLE BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 DK - 2800 LYNGBY / DK Opponent's representative Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | 20.04.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.08.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.08.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.09.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.03.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0057604 (NIPPON UNICAR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1,4,13 *; | [A]JPH0456009 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920609), vol. 16, no. 254, Database accession no. (E - 1213), & JP04056009 A 19920224 (CENTRAL RES INST OF ELECTRIC POWER IND) [A] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | JPS57199108 | JPS54115798 | JPS5562610 | EP0389611 | WO9304486 |