EP0646998 - Crimping tool for the connection of an electric cable to a terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tournier, Gilles 20, rue du Laurageais F-31490 Leguevin / FR | 02 /
Seguier, Stéphane 46, Boulevard Riquet F-31000 Toulouse / FR | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Poulin, Gérard Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/14] | Poulin, Gérard Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402177.3 | 29.09.1994 | [1995/14] | Priority number, date | FR19930011712 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9311712 | [1995/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646998 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646998 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/042 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
H01R43/042 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53226 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1995/14] | Title | German: | Crimpwerkzeug zum Verbinden eines elektrischen Kabels mit einem Endstück | [1995/14] | English: | Crimping tool for the connection of an electric cable to a terminal | [1995/14] | French: | Outil de sertissage pour le raccordement d'un câble électrique dans un élément d'extrémité | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE435274 (METALLBANK FA, et al) [A] 1,9 * page 1, line 10 - line 19 * * page 2, line 49 - line 69; figure 1 *; | [YA]FR1287793 (CANNON ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1,8 * page 2, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column R, paragraph 1 - page 4, column L, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 * [A] 2,3,7; | [Y]US3491577 (LINGENBRINK HERMANN E F C) [Y] 1,8 * column 3, line 13 - line 26 * * column 4, line 17 - line 23; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9314535 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 19 - line 25; figures 2A-2F *; | [D]FR2686459 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) |