EP0651242 - Procedure and device for the detection and localisation of gas leak in a double-walled containment vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [1998/17] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Journeau, Christophe 6, rue du Val d'Orient F-13770 Venelles / FR | 02 /
Thomann, Frédéric 15, rue Vaillante F-84120 Pertuis / FR | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402424.9 | 27.10.1994 | [1995/18] | Priority number, date | FR19930012939 | 29.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9312939 | [1995/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651242 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651242 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/24 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
G01M3/24 (EP);
G01D5/54 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, LI, SE [1995/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung für die Detektion und Ortung eines Gaslecks in einem doppelwandigen Sicherheitsbehälter | [1995/18] | English: | Procedure and device for the detection and localisation of gas leak in a double-walled containment vessel | [1995/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection et de localisation de fuite de gaz d'une enceinte de confinement à double paroi | [1995/18] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 02.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.04.1998 | SE | 22.07.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [1998/44] | SE | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5231866 (PEACOCK MARTIN J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 34; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0140174 (KRAFTWERK UNION AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0481633 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920703), vol. 16, no. 301, Database accession no. (P - 1379), & JP04081633 A 19920316 (HITACHI LTD.) [A] 1 * abstract * |