EP0654598 - Thrust reverser for a turbofan engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HISPANO-SUIZA AEROSTRUCTURES 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Hispano-Suiza Aerostructures 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Hispano Suiza Aerostructures 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states HISPANO-SUIZA 333, Bureaux de la Colline F-92213 Saint Cloud / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Cambray, Elisabeth, Lucette Francine Christine 91, Bd de Strasbourg F-76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
Vicogne, Laurent Marcel 18, rue des Clos Molinons F-76700 Gonfreville l'Orcher / FR | [1995/21] | Representative(s) | Berrou, Paul Snecma Moteurs Propriété Intellectuelle, B.P. 81 91003 Evry Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Berrou, Paul S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402669.9 | 23.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | FR19930014036 | 24.11.1993 Original published format: FR 9314036 | [1995/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654598 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654598 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/70 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
F02K1/70 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/21] | Title | German: | Schubumkehrvorrichtung für ein Bläsertriebwerk | [1995/21] | English: | Thrust reverser for a turbofan engine | [1995/21] | French: | Inverseur de poussée de turboreacteur à double flux | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2146109 (BRUNER GEORGES) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4030291 (SARGISSON DONALD FARLEY) [X] 1-3,5 * column W *; | [A]US3614037 (VDOLEK ALEXANDER V) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US3172256 (HENRY KERRY THOMAS, et al) [A] 1 * column W * |