EP0657187 - Implantable cardiac pacemaker with controlled frequency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/24] | Implantable cardiac pacemaker with controlled frequency and its method of control | ||
[1999/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL 98-100, rue Maurice Arnoux 92541 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states ELA MEDICAL 98-100, Rue Maurice Arnoux F-92541 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouhour, Anne 13, Rue de la Vistule F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Legay, Thierry 45, Rue F. Dreyfus Bel Air F-91640 Fontenay Les Briis / FR | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402775.4 | 05.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | FR19930014578 | 06.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9314578 | [1995/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657187 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657187 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/36514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Implantierbarer Herzschrittmacher mit gesteuerter Frequenz | [1999/35] | English: | Implantable cardiac pacemaker with controlled frequency | [1999/35] | French: | Stimulateur cardiaque implantable à fréquence asservie | [1999/35] |
Former [1995/24] | Implantierbarer Herzschrittmacher mit gesteuerter Frequenz und dessen Steuerungsverfahren | ||
Former [1995/24] | Implantable cardiac pacemaker with controlled frequency and its method of control | ||
Former [1995/24] | Stimulateur cardiaque implantable à fréquence asservie et son procédé de commande | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 27.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.10.2000 | [2001/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0493220 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,11 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 46; figure - *; | [A]EP0493222 (ELA MEDICAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,11 * page 3, column 3, line 28 - page 5, column 7, line 53; figure - *; | [A]EP0498533 (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [A] 1-4,11 * page 3, column 4, line 34 - page 5, column 7, line 45; figure - *; | [AD]US5074302 (POORE JOHN W [US], et al) [AD] 1,11 * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 2; figure - * |