EP0657408 - Fluorination in the vapour phase using crystallized catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4/8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM S.A. 4 & 8, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, François 50 Chemin du Bois F-69530 Brignais / FR | 02 /
Lacroix, Eric Le bourg F-69480 Amberieux d'Azergues / FR | 03 /
Lerch, Alain 2 Rue Barrau F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
Rousset, Abel 16 Rue Jean Moulin F-31520 Ramonville / FR | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Atofina D.C.R.D./D.P.I. 4, Cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris la Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Leboulenger, Jean, et al Elf Atochem S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle, Cedex 42 - La Défense 10 F-92091 Paris la Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402779.6 | 05.12.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | FR19930014779 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9314779 | [1995/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657408 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0657408 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C19/08 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B01J37/26 (EP);
C07C17/206 (EP,KR);
C07C19/08 (KR);
C07C2523/86 (KR);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1995/24] | Title | German: | Fluorierung in der Gasphase mittels kristallisierter Katalysatoren | [1995/24] | English: | Fluorination in the vapour phase using crystallized catalysts | [1995/24] | French: | Fluoration en phase gazeuse au moyen de catalyseurs cristallisés | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 13.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0546883 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * claim - *; | [DA]EP0548742 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0554165 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 5; claim - * |