EP0658774 - Location method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL CIT 12, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/52] |
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CGTI 35, rue Jean Jaurès F-95870 Bezons / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maignan, Michel 13, rue Marie Curie F-91380 Chilly Mazarin / FR | 02 /
Boby, Joel 5, Impasse des Gazelles F-93370 Montfermeil / FR | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Bourely, Paul, et al c/o ALCATEL ALSTHOM, Département de Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [1999/52] |
Former [1995/25] | Bourely, Paul SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402870.3 | 13.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | FR19930015170 | 16.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315170 | [1995/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658774 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658774 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/87, G01S13/04 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
B61L25/026 (EP);
G01S13/04 (EP);
G01S13/878 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT [1995/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Orten | [1995/25] | English: | Location method and system | [1995/25] | French: | Procédé et système de localisation | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.03.2000 | GB | 15.03.2000 | GR | 15.03.2000 | IT | 15.03.2000 | DE | 16.06.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/07] | FR | 15.03.2000 | |
GB | 15.03.2000 | ||
GR | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/32] | FR | 15.03.2000 | |
GB | 15.03.2000 | ||
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | GB | 15.03.2000 | |
DE | 16.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 15.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3124068 (LICENTIA PATENT-VERWALTUNGS-GMBH) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3533479 (SEBA-DYNATRONICS) [A] 1 * column 3, line 14 - line 50; figure 1 * |