EP0662376 - Flexible sheet structure, process for its manufacture and packaging made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements René LACROIX et Cie 32, Le Village, BP 20 39220 Bois D'Amont / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states Etablissements René LACROIX ET Cie 32, Le Village, BP 20 F-39220 Bois D'Amont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacroix, Jean-Pierre, Cabinet BALLOT-SCHMIT 5, Avenue Elisée Cusenier F-25000 Besancon / FR | 02 /
Gras, Christian, Cabinet BALLOT-SCHMIT 5, Avenue Elisée Cusenier F-25000 Besancon / FR | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 5 Avenue Elisée Cusenier 25000 Besançon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet BALLOT-SCHMIT, 5, Avenue Elisée Cusenier F-25000 Besançon / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402899.2 | 15.12.1994 | [1995/28] | Priority number, date | FR19930015840 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315840 | [1995/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662376 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662376 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B27D1/08 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
B65D9/02 (EP);
B27D1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Flexible Bahn, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und daraus bestehende Verpackungen | [1995/28] | English: | Flexible sheet structure, process for its manufacture and packaging made therefrom | [1995/28] | French: | Complexe souple en feuille, procédé de fabrication et emballage comportant un tel complexe | [1995/28] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 28.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.1997 | DK | 03.09.1997 | ES | 03.09.1997 | GR | 03.09.1997 | IT | 03.09.1997 | NL | 03.09.1997 | PT | 03.12.1997 | SE | 03.12.1997 | LU | 15.12.1997 | BE | 31.12.1997 | CH | 31.12.1997 | LI | 31.12.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
ES | 03.09.1997 | ||
GR | 03.09.1997 | ||
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
NL | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
LU | 15.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
ES | 03.09.1997 | ||
GR | 03.09.1997 | ||
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
NL | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
ES | 03.09.1997 | ||
GR | 03.09.1997 | ||
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
GR | 03.09.1997 | ||
IE | 03.09.1997 | ||
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
IE | 03.09.1997 | ||
IT | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
IE | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
CH | 31.12.1997 | ||
LI | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/49] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
DK | 03.09.1997 | ||
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
PT | 03.12.1997 | ||
SE | 03.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.09.1997 | |
SE | 03.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR620084 (ASTRA ETS) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 15 *; | [Y]US2043026 (ARNOLD CHARLES B) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, column L, line 45 - column R, line 7; figure 3 *; | [A]FR803996 (CARRIERES ET CAISSERIES DE BRO) [A] 1,2,5,6 * page 1, line 12 - line 20; figure 1 *; | [A]US2296781 (CYRIL FARNY) [A] 1,4-6 * page 2, column L, line 12 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE972283 (LE BOIS BAKELISE SOC) [A] 1,2,5,6* page 2, line 89 - line 102; figure 1 * |