EP0660600 - Voltage adder and adder-matrix for a thermal imager [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/26] | Voltage adder and adder-mosaic for a thermal imager | ||
[1998/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [1999/09] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audier, Marcel-Francis THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Lincot, Georges, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/24] | Lincot, Georges, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/26] | Taboureau, James, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94402946.1 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | FR19930015547 | 23.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315547 | [1995/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660600 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660600 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/33, H04N3/15 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
H04N25/768 (EP);
H04N23/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/26] | Title | German: | Spannungsaddierer und Addierer-Matrize für ein Wärmebildgerät | [1998/21] | English: | Voltage adder and adder-matrix for a thermal imager | [1998/21] | French: | Sommateur de tensions, et matrice de sommateurs, pour appareil d'imagerie thermique | [1998/21] |
Former [1995/26] | Spannungsaddierer und Addierer-Mosaik für ein Wärmebildgerät | ||
Former [1995/26] | Voltage adder and adder-mosaic for a thermal imager | ||
Former [1995/26] | Sommateur de tensions, et mosaique de sommateurs, pour appareil d'imagerie thermique | Examination procedure | 28.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.03.1999 | IT | 03.03.1999 | NL | 03.03.1999 | DE | 05.06.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2000/20] | GB | 03.03.1999 | |
NL | 03.03.1999 | ||
DE | 05.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 03.03.1999 | |
NL | 03.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | NL | 03.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0137704 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0207826 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0230809 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SA [FR]); | [A]WO8707769 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]EP0435773 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |