EP0718152 - Intermittent data communication on indicator supply wiring of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortais, Paul 6, rue Pierre Curie 91370 Verrières-Le-Buisson / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states Ortais, Paul 6, rue Pierre Curie F-91370 Verrières-Le-Buisson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 94402949.5 | 20.12.1994 | [1996/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0718152 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/38, H04B3/54 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
H04B3/548 (EP);
H04B2203/5458 (EP);
H04B2203/547 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | Intermittierende Datenübertragung über die Blinklichtversorgungsleitung eines Fahrzeugs | [1996/26] | English: | Intermittent data communication on indicator supply wiring of a vehicle | [1996/26] | French: | Communication de données au moyen du fil d'alimentation du clignotant d'un véhicule | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 01.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/28] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.1996 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | 25.01.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.02.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.1997 | 01.01.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4111223 (T.E.L.L. STEUERUNGSSYSTEME TERBACK GMBH & CO.) [A] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 34; claim 1 *; | [A]US4739309 (BRÄUNINGER ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 26 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 37; figure . *; | [E]FR2708360 (ORTAIS) [E] 1-5 * the whole document * |