EP0661552 - Method of acoustical positioning of a towed vehicle behind a boat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loison, Jean-Yves Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Desperrier, Jean-Louis, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94403051.9 | 28.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | FR19930015884 | 30.12.1993 Original published format: FR 9315884 | [1995/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661552 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/808, G01S5/22 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G01S5/22 (EP);
G01S3/8083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur akustischen Bestimmung der Position eines Fahrzeuges das durch ein Boot geschleppt wird | [1995/27] | English: | Method of acoustical positioning of a towed vehicle behind a boat | [1995/27] | French: | Procédé de localisation acoustique d'un véhicule remorqué par un bateau | [1995/27] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 06.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/39] | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2113391 (INSTITUTE FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 49 - page 2, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3953827 (LE MOAL ET AL) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 65; figure 4 *; | [A]US4425635 (YAMAMOTO ET AL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 44 - line 62; figure 16 *; | [A]DE3239403 (FRIED. KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * |