EP0628264 - Operating device for opening and closing a parasol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revelut, Daniel Le Nicolas F-69220 Charentay / FR | [1994/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94420163.1 | 06.06.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | FR19930007019 | 07.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307019 | [1994/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628264 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A45B25/14, A45B23/00 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
A45B25/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Öffnen und zum Schliessen eines Sonnenschirms | [1994/50] | English: | Operating device for opening and closing a parasol | [1994/50] | French: | Dispositif de manoeuvre de l'ouverture et de la fermeture d'un parasol | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/27] | 01.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE8715945U (MAY) [DY] 1-4 * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [DY]FR2520211 (COLLET) [DY] 1-4 * page 13, line 29 - page 14, line 6; figures 25-27 *; | [A]US2745421 (RUSSELL) [A] 5 * column 2, line 34 - line 38; figures 1,2 * |