EP0653671 - System for monitoring and controlling supersaturation in AGX precipitations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lin, Mitchell M., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Wey, Jong Shinn, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/41] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/20] | Boulard, Denis, et al Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets CRT-Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94420222.5 | 29.07.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930108160 | 17.08.1993 Original published format: US 108160 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653671 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/015 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
G03C1/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | System zur Überwachung und Steuerung der Übersättigung in AgX-Fällungen | [1995/20] | English: | System for monitoring and controlling supersaturation in AGX precipitations | [1995/20] | French: | Système permettant de surveiller et de réguler la supersaturation dans des précipitations d'AgX | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/35] | 25.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0531736 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * See page 6, lines 35-52 and claims *; | US5317521 [ ] (LIN MING-JYE [US], et al) [ ] * (cited on page 1 of the application) *; | [A]EP0356342 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * See claims *; | US4933870 [ ] (CHANG YUN C [US]) [ ] * (cited on page 2 of the application) *; | [A]US3999048 (PARTHEMORE KEITH GORDON) [A] 1-7 * See claims * |