EP0623285 - Automatic purging installation for a dough sausage production line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 10 60 50 70049 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/10] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Société TOGUM Rue de l'Industrie F-67116 Reichstett / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Towae, Gérard 167 route de la Wantzenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/17] |
Former [1994/45] | Metz, Paul Cabinet METZ PATNI, 63, rue de la Ganzau F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 94440030.8 | 04.05.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | FR19930005550 | 05.05.1993 Original published format: FR 9305550 | [1994/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623285 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623285 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A21C11/16, A23G3/30 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
A23G4/00 (EP);
A21C11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | Automatische Reinigungsanlage für eine Fertigungsstrasse zur Herstellung eines länglichen Teigkörpers | [1998/11] | English: | Automatic purging installation for a dough sausage production line | [1994/45] | French: | Installation de purge automatique pour une ligne de production d'un boudin de produit pâteux | [1994/45] |
Former [1994/45] | Automatische Entlüftungsanlage für eine Fertigungsstrasse zur Herstellung eines länglichen Teigkörpers | Examination procedure | 06.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0524902 (G. TOWAE) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4480753 (J.P. THOMAS) [A] 1-4 * column A; figure - *; | [A]GB2011827 (K. LOSER) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |