EP0612502 - Multi-dimensional visualization apparatus for observing tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S. S. B. CO., LTD. 18-8, Kasuga 2-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states S. S. B. CO., LTD. 18-8, Kasuga 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Tatsumori 31-5, Hakusan 5-chome, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Seiji 33-17, Koenjikita 3-chome Suginami-ku, Tokyo 166 / JP | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Patrice Vidon, Immeuble Germanium, 80, Avenue des Buttes de Coesmes F-35700 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 94460004.8 | 23.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | JP19930059391 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: JP 5939193 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612502 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612502 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14, G01S7/52 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
A61B8/467 (EP,US);
A61B8/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/0858 (KR);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/52 (KR);
A61B8/5238 (EP,US);
G01N29/22 (KR);
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52026 (EP,US);
G01S7/52034 (EP,US);
G01S7/52084 (EP,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
Y10S128/916 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/35] | Title | German: | Multi-dimentionales Sichtgerät zur Beobachtung von Gewebe | [1994/35] | English: | Multi-dimensional visualization apparatus for observing tissue | [1994/35] | French: | Appareil de visualisation en dimensions multiples pour observer le tissu | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2074733 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 107 - page 3, line 74; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US4787393 (FUKUKITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,13,14,18 * column 2, line 67 - column 6, line 22 * * column 11, line 12 - column 12, line 27; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9103792 (MONTEFIORE MED CENTER [US]) [A] 1,9,10,13,24 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 30 ** page 6, line 1 - page 15, line 29; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0452532 (FURUHATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 11 - column 9, line 38; figures 5,6 *; | [Y]EP0487339 (ADVANCED TECH LAB [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 18 - column 9, line 55; figures 1-7 * |