EP0657654 - Fluid pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campen, Clifford Howard 120 McJunkin Road Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | 02 /
Drake, James Albert 241 Cornwall Drive Blawnox, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | 03 /
Veronesi, Luciano 102 Glenn David Drive Blawnox, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | 04 /
Jenkins, Leonard Stanley 140 Conneaut Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | 05 /
Kujawski, Joseph Michael 5947 Graybrooke Drive Export, Pennsylvania 15632 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 94650035.2 | 25.11.1994 | [1995/24] | Priority number, date | US19930164299 | 09.12.1993 Original published format: US 164299 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0657654 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/06, F04D29/22, F04D29/66, F04D29/04, F04D29/06, F04D3/00 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
F04D29/0467 (EP,US);
F04D3/00 (KR);
F04D13/0646 (EP,US);
F04D29/061 (EP,US);
F04D29/2277 (EP,US);
F04D29/669 (EP,US);
F04D3/005 (EP,US);
F05B2240/52 (EP,US);
F05B2240/54 (EP,US);
F05B2240/61 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | Flussigkeitspumpe | [1995/24] | English: | Fluid pump | [1995/24] | French: | Pompe pour fluides | [1995/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/06] | 22.08.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3143972 (SMITH WATT V, et al) [X] 1-5,12,13 * column 1, line 14 - line 17 * * column 2, line 40 - column 5, line 67 * * column 6, line 17 - line 42; figures 1,4 * [A] 7,11; | [XA]FR1312504 (RAOULX) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3,12,13; | [A]EP0368558 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2154217 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 7-9 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3826595 (BOTTOMS H) [A] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5209650 (LEMIEUX GUY B [CA]) |