EP0609172 - Method for measuring the lengths of wound material arriving on a reel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benninger AG Fabrikstrasse CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | [1994/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Hans-Peter Bogenstrasse 41 CH-9230 Flawil / CH | 02 /
Gemperli, Hans-Peter Rosenbergstrasse 23 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Marktgasse 18 CH-9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810010.2 | 11.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | CH19930000229 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: CH 22993 | [1994/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609172 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609172 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01B21/06 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
G01B21/06 (EP,US);
B65H61/00 (EP,US);
D02H13/10 (EP,US);
D03J1/20 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1994/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Länge von auf einen Wickel auflaufendem Wickelgut | [1994/31] | English: | Method for measuring the lengths of wound material arriving on a reel | [1994/31] | French: | Procédé pour la mesure de largeurs de matériau enroulé sur une bobine | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4159572 (NUNES JAMES A) [A] 1 * column W *; | [DA]DE3215322 (SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]); | [A]EP0017613 (MAYER STEPHAN) |