EP0611258 - Pad printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teca-Print AG Bohlstrasse 17 CH-8240 Thayngen / CH | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachmann, Louis Traubenstrasse 18 CH-9500 Wil / CH | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1994/33] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Stampfenbachstrasse 48 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810063.1 | 07.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | CH19930000439 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: CH 43993 | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611258 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611258 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41F17/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
B41F17/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Tampondruckmaschine | [1994/33] | English: | Pad printing machine | [1994/33] | French: | Machine d'impression au tampon | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0276537 (NAVITAS KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | [X] - Broschüre: Morlock Tampondruck-Systeme "Tampondruckmaschine MTM 100" Fespa - 5/5/1988 [X] 1-10 | [A] - Broschüre: Teca-Print AG "TC 70" Fespa - 5/5/1988 [A] 1-10 | Examination | CH527699 |