EP0611812 - Liquid coating composition forming a liquid crystal display element insulating film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 3-7-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nogami, Tatsuya, c/o Central Research Institute of Nissan Chemical Industries, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Rie, c/o Central Research Institute of Nissan Chemical Industries, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Hosoya, Takeshi, c/o Central Research Institute of Nissan Chemical Industries, 722-1, Tsuboi-cho Funabashi-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810093.8 | 17.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | JP19930029213 | 18.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2921393 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0611812 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0611812 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611812 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/04, C09D183/14, G02F1/1333 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
G02F1/133345 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/04 (EP,KR,US);
C09D183/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2323/02 (EP,US);
C09K2323/053 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/52 (US,EP);
C09D183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/54 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1994/34] | C09D183/04, C09D183/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/34] | Title | German: | Flüssige Beschichtungssuzammensetzung, einen Isolationsfilm für Flüssigkristallanzeigelemente bildend | [1994/34] | English: | Liquid coating composition forming a liquid crystal display element insulating film | [1994/34] | French: | Composition liquide de revêtement formant un film isolant pour élément à cristal liquide. | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 31.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9300879 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-4 * examples 9,11 *; | [A]DE3917535 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]US4501872 (CHANG WEN-HSUAN [US], et al) [A] 1; | [A]DE3830427 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 |