EP0613721 - Method, its application and device for grinding and treating recycling products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strittmatter, Herbert Jurastrasse 32 CH-5000 Aarau / CH | [1994/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/36] | Representative(s) | Fillinger, Peter Dr. P. Fillinger Patentanwalt AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Fillinger, Peter, Dr. Dr. P. Fillinger Patentanwalt AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1994/36] | Fillinger, Peter, Dr. Rütistrasse 1a, Postfach CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810127.4 | 01.03.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | CH19930000619 | 02.03.1993 Original published format: CH 61993 | [1994/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0613721 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0613721 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/13, B02C13/288, B02C23/24 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
B02C13/13 (EP);
B02C13/288 (EP);
B02C23/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren und dessen Anwendung sowie Vorrichtung zum Zerkleinern und Aufbereiten von Recycling-Produkten | [1994/36] | English: | Method, its application and device for grinding and treating recycling products | [1994/36] | French: | Procédé, son utilisation et dispositif de brayage et de traitement de produits de recyclage | [1994/36] | Examination procedure | 08.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9005026 (AKT CONSUTANTS PTY) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10,12-15 * page 17, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph L - page 25, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [Y] 2,5,8,11; | [Y]US2793119 (A.J. MOLDENHAUER) [Y] 2,8,11 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 52; figure 1 *; | [YA]DE1209792 (MASCHINENFABRIK W. LEY) [Y] 5 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [XY]DE2126895 (KLÖCKNER-HUMBOLDT-DEUTZ) [X] 1,3,4,9 * page 1 * * page 6 - page 7 * * figure - * [Y] 2; | [Y]DE1252046 (KOHLENSCHEIDUNGS-GES.) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 4 * * figure . *; | [X]GB605478 (J.M. PEHRSON) [X] 1,4,9 * page 1, line 10 - line 70 * * page 4, line 5 - line 117 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0053755 (EISENEGGER) |