EP0625387 - Strip casting machine for metals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY RHENALU Tour Manhattan, 6, Place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1997/04] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states LAUENER ENGINEERING LTD. Stationsstrasse 21B CH-3645 Gwatt / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maiwald, Klaus Peter Pfaffenbühlweg 18 D CH-3600 Thun / CH | 02 /
Meyer, Michel Rte. Yverdon 33 CH-1470 Estavayer-le-Lac / CH | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 CH-8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810247.0 | 02.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | CH19930001506 | 18.05.1993 Original published format: CH 150693 | [1994/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625387 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625387 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B22D11/0642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU [1994/47] | Title | German: | Bandgiessanlage für Metalle | [1994/47] | English: | Strip casting machine for metals | [1994/47] | French: | Machine pour la coulée en bande de métaux | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 07.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01224144 ; | [A]CH508433 (PROLIZENZ AG C O SCHWEIZ KREDI [CH]) [A] 6 * figures 1-3; claim . *; | [A]EP0123121 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP0137238 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [Y] 1 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]EP0443204 (LAUENER ENG AG [CH]) [YD] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891205), vol. 13, no. 542, Database accession no. (M - 901)<3890>, & JP01224144 A 19890907 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |