EP0654506 - Process for the manufacture of synergetic mixtures of pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2000/20] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Ciba SC Holding AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hao, Zhimin, Dr. Route du Centre 19 CH-1723 Marly / CH | 02 /
Iqbal, Abul, Dr. La Dey 202 CH-1732 Arconciel / CH | 03 /
Zambounis, John S., Dr. Engelhardstrasse 41 CH-3280 Murten / CH | 04 /
Medinger, Bernhard, Dr. Grottenweg CH-1735 Giffers / CH | [1995/21] | Application number, filing date | 94810650.5 | 14.11.1994 | [1995/21] | Priority number, date | CH19930003477 | 22.11.1993 Original published format: CH 347793 | [1995/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0654506 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0654506 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654506 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B67/54, // C09B57/00, C09B48/00 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C09B68/443 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09B68/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/21] | C09B67/22, // C09B57/00, C09B48/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung synergistischer Pigmentgemische | [1995/21] | English: | Process for the manufacture of synergetic mixtures of pigments | [1995/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de mélanges synergétiques de pigments | [1995/21] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/45] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0376158 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 7 - line 11 * * page 3, line 2 - line 3 * * page 3, line 34 - line 38 *; | [A]US3607336 (JAFFE EDWARD E) [A] 1 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 45 *; | [A]EP0181290 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] * page 9, line 6 - line 15 *; | [T]DE2433692 (NIPPON SODA CO) [T] 1 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 13 * |