EP0658330 - Method and device for cleaning a brewing apparatus, esp. a coffee brewer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE AG Bahnhofstrasse 135 CH-4626 Niederbuchsiten / CH | [1995/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reyhanloo, Shahryar Alpenstrasse 83 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | 02 /
Hermann, Markus Oberrainweg 5 CH-4710 Balsthal / CH | 03 /
Anliker, Markus Hangweg 6 CH-5722 Gränichen / CH | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 94810729.7 | 14.12.1994 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | CH19930003752 | 15.12.1993 Original published format: CH 375293 | [1995/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658330 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658330 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/60 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
A47J31/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Reinigung einer Brühvorrichtung, insbesondere einer Kaffeemaschine | [1995/25] | English: | Method and device for cleaning a brewing apparatus, esp. a coffee brewer | [1995/25] | French: | Procédé et appareil à nettoyer une machine à boisson chaude, notamment une machine à café | [1995/25] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 22.07.1998 | LU | 14.12.1998 | BE | 31.12.1998 | [2004/39] |
Former [2000/23] | PT | 22.07.1998 | |
BE | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | PT | 22.07.1998 | |
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 22.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]US3038492 (SUGGS LEE G, et al) [DX] 1,9,10 * column 6, line 45 - line 53; figure 4 * [A] 2; | [A]US4305328 (KUESER JOHN J, et al) [A] 2,8 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 4; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]DE3316157 (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]); | [A]EP0173651 (NUOVA FAEMA SPA [IT]) [A] 3 * page 7, line 9 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]CH665945 (CAFAG AG) [A] 1,2,5-9 * page 2, column L, line 45 - column R, line 5; figure . * |