EP0667268 - Bristle roller for automatic motor vehicle washing systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.1999 [1999/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FAVAGROSSA EDOARDO S.r.l. Via Lepanto, 51 I-26040 Roncadello (Cremona) / IT | [1995/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favagrossa, Edoardo c/o FACAGROSSA EDOARDO s.r.l., Via Lepanto, 51 I-26040 Roncadello (Cremona) / IT | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 94830138.7 | 24.03.1994 | [1995/33] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI00256 | 11.02.1994 Original published format: IT MI940256 | [1995/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0667268 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0667268 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667268 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B60S3/06, A46B13/00 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
A46B13/001 (EP,US);
A46D1/00 (EP,US);
B60S3/06 (EP,US);
Y10S15/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [1995/33] | B60S3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Bürstenrolle für automatische Kraftfahrzeug-Waschanlage | [1995/33] | English: | Bristle roller for automatic motor vehicle washing systems | [1995/33] | French: | Brosse à rouleau pour installations de lavage de voiture automatisées | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 28.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9115049U (KÄRCHER) [X] 1 * page 6, line 2 - line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE9214265U (KÄRCHER) [X] 1* page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line 5 * |