EP0610165 - Lubricating oil feed device in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states SCANIA CV AKTIEBOLAG S-151 87 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SAAB-SCANIA AKTIEBOLAG S-151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fransson, Hakan Granvägen 27 S-640 50 Björnlunda / SE | 02 /
Örning, Peter Korpvägen 4 S-147 34 Tumba / SE | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/31] |
Former [1994/32] | Waldebäck, Hans Olov Scania CV AB Patents, TY S-151 87 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 94850010.3 | 18.01.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | SE19930000307 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: SE 9300307 | [1994/32] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610165 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610165 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/02, F01M9/10, F02F7/00 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
F01M11/02 (EP,US);
F01M9/108 (EP,US);
F02F7/0073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/32] | Title | German: | Schmierzufuhrvorrichtung in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1994/32] | English: | Lubricating oil feed device in an internal combustion engine | [1994/32] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'huile de lubrification dans un moteur à combustion interne | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3520876 (PETER HUFNAGEL GMBH) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE3609206 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3532695 (AUDI AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0256394 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4977870 (HASHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column A; figure - * |