EP0617104 - Bituminous self-adhesive compositions for low temperature applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/39] | Bituminous self-adhesive when cold compositions | ||
[1998/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states FINA RESEARCH S.A. Zone Industrielle C B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drieskens, Bruno Spanjestraat 95/GV B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | 02 /
Haveaux, Bernard rue de Bruxelles 51 B-1400 Nivelles / BE | [1994/39] | Application number, filing date | 94870050.5 | 23.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | BE19930000288 | 24.03.1993 Original published format: BE 9300288 | [1994/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617104 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617104 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09J195/00, C09J153/02 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C09J195/00 (EP,US);
C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L53/00 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C09J195/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Bituminöses, in der Kälte selbstklebendes Mittel | [1994/39] | English: | Bituminous self-adhesive compositions for low temperature applications | [1998/36] | French: | Compositions bitumineuses auto-adhésives à froid | [1994/39] |
Former [1994/39] | Bituminous self-adhesive when cold compositions | Examination procedure | 13.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.1997 | 31.03.1998 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0009209 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 13, line 28 - page 15, line 38; example 1 * * claims 1,5,6,10 *; | [A]EP0317025 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 42 - page 6, line 26; example 1 ** claims 1-10 * |