EP0660019 - Methode for connecting a plastic pipe fitting with at least two fastening holes to a perforated sheet metal support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/26] | Device for connecting a plastic pipe fitting with at least two fastening holes to a perforated sheet metal support | ||
[1997/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KE-KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 4017 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states KE-KELIT Kunststoffwerk Gesellschaft m.b.H. Ignaz-Mayer-Strasse 17 A-4017 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Helmut Waldburg 76 A-4240 Waldburg bei Freistadt / AT | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 94890186.3 | 28.10.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | AT19930002629 | 27.12.1993 Original published format: AT 262993 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660019 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660019 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/24, E03C1/02 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
E03C1/021 (EP,US);
F16L3/243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1995/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung eines mit weingstens zwei Befestigungslöchern versehenen Rohrleitungs-Formstückes aus Kunststoff an gelochten Blechträgern | [1997/06] | English: | Methode for connecting a plastic pipe fitting with at least two fastening holes to a perforated sheet metal support | [1997/06] | French: | Méthode pour relier une pièce de raccordement de tuyau en matière plastique comportant au moins deux trous de fixation à un support réalisé en tôle métallique perforée | [1997/06] |
Former [1995/26] | Befestigungsvorrichtung für mit wenigstens zwei Befestigungslöchern versehene Rohrleitungs-Formstücke aus Kunststoff an gelochten Blechträgern | ||
Former [1995/26] | Device for connecting a plastic pipe fitting with at least two fastening holes to a perforated sheet metal support | ||
Former [1995/26] | Dispositif pour relier une pièce de raccordement de tuyau en matière plastique comportant au moins deux trous de fixation à un support réalisé en tôle métallique perforée | Examination procedure | 18.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2193280 (ROSENBERG GERHARD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE1775471 (HEHLERT FRIEDRICH, et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE9301520U (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 3 * figure 1 * |