EP0681747 - DISH ANTENNA STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/46] | DISH ANTENNA STRUCTURES AND HYDRAULIC CONTROL OF THE ORIENTATION THEREOF | ||
[2006/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANUTECH PTY. LIMITED Corner North Road and Daly Road Acton, ACT 2601 / AU | [1995/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEFF, Stephen 1 Vancouver Street Red Hill, ACT 2603 / AU | 02 /
WHELAN, Robert, Edgar 10 Waratah Street O'Connor, ACT 2601 / AU | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 94900012.9 | 17.11.1993 | [1995/46] | WO1993AU00588 | Priority number, date | AU1992PL05900 | 17.11.1992 Original published format: AU PL590092 | AU1992PL05901 | 17.11.1992 Original published format: AU PL590192 | [1995/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411918 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681747 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681747 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, E04B1/19, E04H12/10, F15B15/06 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
H01Q3/08 (EP,US);
F24S23/70 (EP,US);
F24S30/452 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1207 (EP,US);
F24S2030/115 (EP,US);
F24S25/13 (EP,US);
Y02E10/47 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | PARABOLANTENNENSTRUKTUR | [2006/01] | English: | DISH ANTENNA STRUCTURES | [2006/01] | French: | STRUCTURES D'ANTENNE PARABOLIQUE | [2006/01] |
Former [1995/46] | PARABOLANTENNENSTRUKTUR UND HYDRAULISCHE STEUERUNG FÜR DEREN AUSRICHTUNG | ||
Former [1995/46] | DISH ANTENNA STRUCTURES AND HYDRAULIC CONTROL OF THE ORIENTATION THEREOF | ||
Former [1995/46] | STRUCTURES D'ANTENNE PARABOLIQUE ET COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE DE LEUR ORIENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121066.3 / EP1182356 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Request for further processing for: | 03.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2004 | Decision despatched | 12.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.09.2003 | Decision despatched | 17.08.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 20.08.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | IE | 17.11.2006 | LU | 17.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/05] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 17.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/16] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE194703 (GESELLSCHAFT FÜR DRAHTLOSE TELEGRAPHIE GMBH) [X] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US3221464 (MILLER ALVIN E) [X] 5,6* column 3, lines 27-39; figures 3,13,14; claims 1-12 *; | [X]US3725946 (QUEQUEN M) [X] 1,2 * column 3, lines 7-25; figures 2,9; claim 1 *; | [X]US3913105 (WILLIAMSON CLYDE E, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 19; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US4655022 (NATORI MICHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 5,6 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 68; figures 3,4,11,12; claim 1 *; | [XA] - FAGER J A AND GARRIOTT R, "Large-aperture expandable truss microwave antenna", IEEE TRANSACTION ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, NEW YORK, USA, (196907), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 452 - 458, XP002045546 [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 452, column R, lines 4-23; figures 2,3,9,10 * [A] 3,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1969.1139477 | [XA] - HOOGHOUDT B G AND VAN DEN BRINK W C, "Eerste antenna voor het ptt grondstation voor satellietcommunicatie in bedrijf", DE INGENIEUR, NETHERLANDS, (19731018), vol. 85, no. 42, pages 819 - 828, XP002045547 [X] 1-3 * page 822, column L, line 1 - column R, line 13; figures 2,5,6,9 * [A] 4-6 | International search | [XA]AU1776170 ; | [A]SU223553 ; | [A]US3220152 (STURM ROLLAND G); | [A]FR2293614 (HAVRE CHANTIERS [FR]); | [A]US3986434 (KOHLER KARL ALBERT); | [A]FR2453297 (BOUTER ANDRE [NL]); | [X]GB1599527 (MARCONI CO LTD); | [A]FR2530745 (SALZGITTER AG [DE]); | [A]US4558551 (SEVELINGE GERARD [FR], et al); | [A]US4650361 (SEUSTER WALTER [DE]); | [XA]EP0226160 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - Derwent Soviet Inventions Illustrated, Section 3, Mechanical and General, issued April 1969, Engines, Pumps, Boilers, Refrigerators, p 13; & SU,A,223553 (NAZININ) 13 November 1968 (13.11.68), whole document., & SU223553 A 00000000 |