EP0669000 - TWO-SITE IMMUNOASSAY FOR AN ANTIBODY WITH CHEMILUMINESCENT LABEL AND BIOTIN BOUND LIGAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALK A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [1996/24] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states ALK LABORATORIERNE A/S Boge Alle 10-12 DK-2970 Horsholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSEN, Niels Skyttevangen 43 DK-3450 Aller d / DK | 02 /
IPSEN, Hans-Henrik Egevej 16 DK-3400 Hiller d / DK | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Kyed, Iver Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Kyed, Iver c/o LEHMANN & REE A/S Grundtvigsvej 37 DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 94900067.3 | 15.11.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993DK00373 | Priority number, date | DK19920001379 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: DK 137992 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411734 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669000 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669000 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/68 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP);
G01N33/543 (KR);
G01N33/54326 (EP);
G01N33/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | ZWEISEITEN-IMMUNOASSAY FÜR EINEN ANTIKÖRPER MIT CHEMILUMINESZIERENDEM MARKER UND BIOTIN-GEBUNDENEM LIGANDEN | [1995/35] | English: | TWO-SITE IMMUNOASSAY FOR AN ANTIBODY WITH CHEMILUMINESCENT LABEL AND BIOTIN BOUND LIGAND | [1995/35] | French: | TITRAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE D'UN ANTICORPS SUR DEUX SITES, AVEC MARQUAGE CHIMIOLUMINESCENT ET LIGAND LIE A LA BIOTINE | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 07.05.1997 | PT | 07.08.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/03] | PT | 07.08.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Clinical and Experimental Allergy, Volume 22, 1992, J. KLEINE-TEBBE et al., "Comparison between MAGIC LITE(R)- and CAP(R)- System: Two Automated Specific IgE Antibody Assays", page 475 - page 484, see p 476 and ref. 5, 6 and 15. | [Y] - Methods in Enzymology, Volume 73, 1981, J.L. GUESDON et al., "Magnetic Solid-Phase Enzyme Immunoassay for the Quantitation of Antigens and Antibodies: Application to Human Immunoglobulin E", page 471. | [A] - Journal of Immunological Methods, Volume 116, 1989, M. SAKAGUCHI et al., "Measurement of Antigen-Specific Mouse IgE by a Fluorometric Reverse (IgE-Capture) ELISA", page 181 - page 187, fig 1, pages 182-183. | [Y] - National Library of Medicine, File Medline, NLM Accession No. 87281685, HART, R.C.: "The Use of Acridinium Ester-Labelled Streptavidin in Immunoassays"; & J Immunol Methods 1987 Jul 16;101(1);91-6. | [A] - National Library of Medicine, file Medline, NLM Accession No. 89102665, BAGAZGOITIA, F.J.: "Effect of Surfactants on the Intensity of Chemiluminescence Emission from Acridinium Ester Labelled Proteins"; & J Biolumin Chemilumin 1988 Jul-Sep;2(3):121-8. | [A] - Methods in Enzymology, Volume 184, 1990, C.J. STRASBURGER et al., "Two-Site and Competitive Chemiluminescent Immunoassays", page 481 - page 496. | Examination | - NATL. LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, File Medline; R.C. HART, AN 87281685 |