EP0670078 - IMAGE-GENERATING DEVICE USING THE LUMINESCENCE EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON TUBES ELECTRONIQUES 13, Avenue Morane Saulnier, Bâtiment Chavez, Vélizy Espace 78140 Vélizy / FR | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states THOMSON TUBES ELECTRONIQUES 13, avenue Morane-Saulnier, Bâtiment Chavez, Velizy Espace F-78140 Velizy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GROOT, Paul Thomson-CSF SCPI, Boîte Postale 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94900195.2 | 16.11.1993 | [1995/36] | WO1993FR01120 | Priority number, date | FR19920013969 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: FR 9213969 | [1995/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413005 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670078 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670078 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/50 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
H01J31/501 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1995/36] | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUR BILDVERSTÄRKUNG MITTELS LUMINESZENZ | [1995/36] | English: | IMAGE-GENERATING DEVICE USING THE LUMINESCENCE EFFECT | [1995/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF GENERATEUR D'IMAGES PAR EFFET DE LUMINESCENCE | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6038490 ; | [X]DE2544094 (KRETZTECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1,16 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * claim 1 * * figure 3 *; | [A]JPH02170332 ; | [A]US4318122 (WHITE JAMES M) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4952794 (KEMNER RUDOLF [NL], et al) [A] 1,15 * Abrégé * * figure 1 * * claims 1-6 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850711), vol. 9, no. 166, Database accession no. (C - 290), & JP60038490 A 19850228 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1,16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900917), vol. 14, no. 433, Database accession no. (E - 979), & JP02170332 A 19900702 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US4512912 | FR2195841 | EP0536833 |