EP0670295 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUORO-2-BUTENE AND 1,1,1,4,4,4,-HEXAFLUOROBUTANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOYAMA, Hirokazu, Yodogawa Works of Daikin Industries Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566 / JP | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94900280.2 | 18.11.1993 | [1995/36] | WO1993JP01690 | Priority number, date | JP19920335315 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: JP 33531592 | [1995/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412454 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670295 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670295 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C21/18, C07C17/26, C07C19/08, C07C17/00 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/263 (EP,US);
C07C17/269 (EP,US);
C07C17/354 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/263, C07C21/18 (EP,US);
C07C17/269, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/354, C07C19/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUORO-2-BUTEN UND 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUOROBUTAN | [1995/36] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUORO-2-BUTENE AND 1,1,1,4,4,4,-HEXAFLUOROBUTANE | [1995/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUORO-2-BUTENE ET DE 1,1,1,4,4,4-HEXAFLUOROBUTANE | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1995 | Translation filed | 19.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 19.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 30.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - R.N.HASZELDINE, "The addition of free radicals to unsaturated systems.Part I.The direction of radical addition to 3:3:3-trifluoropropene", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LETCHWORTH GB, pages 2504 - 2513 [X] 5 *page 2511,lines19-21;page 2512 lines 29-33* | International search | JPH04264040 [ ] (DAIKIN IND LTD); | JPS58174334 [ ] (UGINE KUHLMANN); | JPH01146831 [ ] (BAYER AG) |