EP0680776 - DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12, Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states SEGA ENTERPRISES, LTD. 2-12 Haneda 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 144 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKA, Yuji 950 High School Way 3203 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Masanobu 112 Rock Harbor Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94900293.5 | 19.11.1993 | [1995/45] | WO1993JP01705 | Priority number, date | US19920979570 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: US 979570 | US19920979577 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: US 979577 | US19920979578 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: US 979578 | US19920979698 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: US 979698 | [1995/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412255 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680776 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/22, G09G5/38 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/52 (KR);
A63F13/577 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
G09G1/007 (EP);
G09G5/42 (EP);
A63F2011/0095 (EP);
A63F2300/203 (EP);
A63F2300/64 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/45] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR KONTROLLE EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [1995/45] | English: | DISPLAY CONTROL METHOD | [1995/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN AFFICHAGE | [1995/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1995 | Translation filed | 16.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 16.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/38] | Divisional application(s) | EP02004988.8 / EP1241657 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026555 (KIRSCHNER WALLACE, et al); | [A]US4738451 (LOGG GEORGE E [US]); | [A]EP0309373 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5080377 (STAMPER TIMOTHY D J [GB], et al); | [A]US5103499 (MINER JAY G [US], et al); | [A]WO9211592 (TRITON TOYS INC [US]) | International search | [A]JPS58121091 (IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI KK); | [YA]JPS6158680 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [XAY]JPS61113489 (TAIHEI GIKEN KOGYO KK) |