EP0666720 - TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA INC. 16700 Trans Canada Kirkland Quebec H9H 4Y8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA INC. 16700 Trans Canada Kirkland, Quebec H9H 4Y8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREDALL, William, A. 540 Dolphin Drive Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | 02 /
GAVINO, Ximena, A. 930 Pine Street, 304 San Francisco, CA 94108 / US | 03 /
LOEW, Christopher 1250 Page Street, No. 4 San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 04 /
VIDRA, James, D. 2170 St. Andrews Road Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | 05 /
SABATO, Alberto, B. 363 Greenoaks Drive Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 06 /
BREUER, Miklos, M. 88 Stanley Road Newton, MA 02168 / US | 07 /
SPENCER, Jean, L. 19 Middle Street, No. 4 Boston, MA 02127 / US | 08 /
WREFORD, Stanley 232 Commercial Street, No. D Boston, MA 02109 / US | 09 /
MEESSMANN, Jeffrey, Scott 952 Pepper Drive Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | 10 /
MCDOWELL, Douglas, J. 1245 Michelle Court Iowa City, IA 52240 / US | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/33] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94900444.4 | 29.10.1993 | [1995/33] | WO1993US10400 | Priority number, date | US19920970331 | 02.11.1992 Original published format: US 970331 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409677 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0666720 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0666720 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
A46D1/0238 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
A46D1/00 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT [1995/33] | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE | [1995/33] | English: | TOOTHBRUSH | [1995/33] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS | [1995/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 14.04.1999 | NL | 14.04.1999 | PT | 14.07.1999 | IE | 29.10.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 14.04.1999 | |
PT | 14.07.1999 | ||
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
IE | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | PT | 14.07.1999 | |
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
IE | 29.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | PT | 14.07.1999 | |
FR | 10.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | FR | 10.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US164353 ; | [Y]US1179426 (HAMILTON JOHN E [US]); | [Y]US2250112 (HELMAR LARSON); | [Y]US2317485 (RIDER THEODORE H); | [Y]US2650383 (BRESSLER LOUIS R); | [A]US2876477 (STEWART GEORGE G); | [A]US3214777 (KUTIK LOUIS F); | [A]US3302230 (AKE POPPELMANN); | [A]GB1076967 (RHODIACETA); | [A]US3344457 (JACQUES GROBERT); | [A]US4167794 (POMEROY ROBERT L); | [Y]CH637279 (WALTHER BUERSTENFABRIK AG [CH]); | [A]US4471505 (SPADEMAN RICHARD G [US]); | [A]US4646381 (WEIHRAUCH GEORG [DE]) |