EP0668859 - PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2,4-OXAZOLIDINEDIONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERNBERG, Jeffrey, Arthur 3111 Loudoun Drive Wilmington, DE 19808-2703 / US | 02 /
SUN, King-Mo 22 Pine Grove Lane Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 03 /
TOJI, Masuo 550 Main Street Sewell, NJ 08080-9710 / US | 04 /
WITTERHOLT, Vincent, Gerard 334 Spalding Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1995/35] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94900457.6 | 05.11.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993US10435 | Priority number, date | US19920976130 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: US 976130 | US19920988574 | 10.12.1992 Original published format: US 988574 | US19930023239 | 25.02.1993 Original published format: US 23239 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411359 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668859 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668859 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/44, C07D233/60, C07D249/08 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
C07D263/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/60 (KR);
C07D249/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,4-OXAZOLIDINEDIONEN | [1995/35] | English: | PROCESSES FOR PREPARING 2,4-OXAZOLIDINEDIONES | [1995/35] | French: | PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE 2,4-OXAZOLIDINEDIONES | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 12.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.02.1997 | BE | 26.02.1997 | DK | 26.02.1997 | GR | 26.02.1997 | NL | 26.02.1997 | PT | 26.05.1997 | SE | 26.05.1997 | IE | 05.11.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
IE | 05.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
GR | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
DK | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
SE | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
PT | 26.05.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 26.02.1997 | |
BE | 26.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 26.02.1997 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0393911 (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1* see pages 13 and 14;equation 10 and 11 * | [A] - D.GEFFKEN, "Synthese von 6,6-disubstituierte 2,5-dioxodihydro-4-H-1,,3,4-dioxazinen und ihre Umwandlung in 3-amino-bzw 3-alkyl(aryl)-2,4-dioxotetrahydro-1,3-oxazole", SYNTHESIS., STUTTGART DE, (198101), no. 1, pages 38 - 40 [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9322299 |