EP0801576 - RED BLOOD CELL APHERESIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/43] | RED BLOOD CELL APHERESIS APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[1999/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAEMONETICS CORPORATION 400 Wood Road Braintree Massachusetts 02184 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states HAEMONETICS CORPORATION 400 Wood Road Braintree Massachusetts 02184 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELL, Claude 22, route du Stand CH-Nyon / CH | 02 /
PAPILLON, Jean 40, avenue Taillevent F-78100 St.-Germain-en-Laye / FR | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2000/03] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [1997/43] | Waldren, Robin Michael MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94900480.8 | 02.11.1993 | [1997/43] | WO1993US10484 | Priority number, date | US19920984029 | 01.12.1992 Original published format: US 984029 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412223 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801576 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0801576 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M1/34 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/304 (EP,US);
A61M1/3603 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0415 (EP,US);
A61M2205/7518 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR APHERESE VON ROTEN BLUTKÖRPERCHEN | [1999/32] | English: | RED BLOOD CELL APHERESIS APPARATUS | [1999/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE PHERESE DES GLOBULES ROUGES | [1999/32] |
Former [1997/43] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR APHERESE VON ROTEN BLUTKöRPERCHEN | ||
Former [1997/43] | RED BLOOD CELL APHERESIS APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [1997/43] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE PHERESE DES GLOBULES ROUGES | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.1995 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4197847 (DJERASSI ISAAC [US]) [A] 18 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 61 - line 66 * * column 9, line 30 - column 10, line 41 *; | [A]EP0128683 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]EP0171749 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10,18,23 * abstract * * page 25, line 14 - page 27, line 23 *; | [A]EP0208061 (BIOTEST PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,18,23 * abstract *; | [A]WO9000059 (SIRCHIA GIROLAMO [IT], et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - line 10 * |