EP0680405 - PHASED SPLIT DIE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STACKPOLE LIMITED 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1995/45] | For all designated states STACKPOLE LIMITED 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINZMANN, Gerd 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | 02 /
HAIKO, Mark 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | 03 /
MA, Frank 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | 04 /
WILSON, Allan 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | 05 /
BUCKLEY-GOLDER, Keith 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | 06 /
ROUND, Robert 2430 Royal Windsor Drive Mississauga, Ontario L5J 1K7 / CA | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, Dr. Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2QP / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 94900676.1 | 24.11.1993 | [1995/45] | WO1993CA00506 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9514568 | Date: | 01.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0680405 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0680405 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/02, B22F3/02 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
B22F3/03 (EP,US);
B30B11/02 (EP,US);
B30B15/022 (EP);
Y10S425/058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | VERSETZTE MEHRTEILIGE PRESSFORM | [1995/45] | English: | PHASED SPLIT DIE | [1995/45] | French: | MATRICE DOUBLE A MISE EN PHASE | [1995/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 05.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1999 | BE | 04.08.1999 | CH | 04.08.1999 | GR | 04.08.1999 | LI | 04.08.1999 | NL | 04.08.1999 | SE | 04.08.1999 | DK | 04.11.1999 | PT | 04.11.1999 | IE | 24.11.1999 | LU | 24.11.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
GR | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
NL | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
DK | 04.11.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
GR | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
NL | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
MC | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
GR | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
NL | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
GR | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
GR | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
IE | 24.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
CH | 04.08.1999 | ||
LI | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
CH | 09.11.1999 | ||
LI | 09.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/26] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | ||
PT | 04.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
BE | 04.08.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3020589 (MARITANO ODDINO S) [A] 1,4,12,14* figure -; claim - *; | [DA]US3752622 (VIADANA S) [DA] 1,4,12,14 * figure -; claim - *; | [DA]US3773446 (BORRINI B) [DA] 1,4,12,14 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3891367 (SIGNORA MAURIZIO) [A] 1,4,12,14 * figure -; claim - * |