EP0667807 - Process for catalytically reacting a gas and a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/34] | CATALYST ELEMENT, REACTOR COMPRISING SUCH CATALYST ELEMENT, DIE FOR PRODUCING SUCH CATALYST ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR THE HYDROGENATING CONVERSION OF AN OIL | ||
[1998/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1999 [1999/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universiteit Delft Julianalaan 134 2628 BL Delft / NL | [1998/31] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states Technische Universiteit Delft Julianalaan 134 NL-2628 BL Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIE, Swan, Tiong Laan van Vogelenzang 8 NL-1217 PH Hilversum / NL | 02 /
CYBULSKI, Andrzej Westeinde 93 NL-2275 AC Voorburg / NL | 03 /
MOULIJN, Jacob, Adriaan 2e Sweelinckstraat 144 NL-2517 HB Den Haag / NL | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 94901066.4 | 04.11.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993NL00231 | Priority number, date | NL19920001923 | 04.11.1992 Original published format: NL 9201923 | [1995/34] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409901 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667807 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667807 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J35/02, B01J19/32 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
B01J19/2485 (EP,US);
B01J19/24 (EP,US);
B01J19/32 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32293 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32296 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur katalytischen Reaktion zwischen einem Gas und einer Flüssigkeit | [1998/31] | English: | Process for catalytically reacting a gas and a liquid | [1998/31] | French: | Procédé de réaction catalytique entre un gaz et un liquide | [1998/31] |
Former [1995/34] | KATALYSATORELEMENT, REAKTOR MIT SO EINEM KATALYSATORELEMENT UND MUNDSTÜCK FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON SO EINEM KATALYSATORELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG DURCHHYDRIERUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | ||
Former [1995/34] | CATALYST ELEMENT, REACTOR COMPRISING SUCH CATALYST ELEMENT, DIE FOR PRODUCING SUCH CATALYST ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR THE HYDROGENATING CONVERSION OF AN OIL | ||
Former [1995/34] | ELEMENT CATALYSEUR, REACTEUR COMPORTANT UN TEL ELEMENT CATALYSEUR, FILIERE DE FABRICATION DUDIT ELEMENT CATALYSEUR, ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFORMATION DE PETROLE PAR HYDROGENATION | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1995 | Translation filed | 06.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 30.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2346048 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]US4135018 (BONIN GEORGE E, et al); | [Y]EP0191982 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-3; claims 1-5 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 16 *; | [Y]EP0226306 (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * figure 8; claims 1,10 *; | [A]EP0279159 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) |