EP0675889 - ANTIALLERGIC TRIAZOLO(PYRROLO, THIENO OR FURANO)AZEPINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSENS, Frans, Eduard Tinstraat 79 B-2820 Bonheiden / BE | 02 /
LACRAMPE, Jean, Fernand, Armand 32, rue Charles-Peguy F-76520 Franqueville-Saint-Pierre / FR | 03 /
PILATTE, Isabelle, Noelle, Constance 10, rue Pavée F-76100 Rouen / FR | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2000/43] |
Former [1995/41] | Wante, Dirk, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 94901888.1 | 25.11.1993 | [1995/41] | WO1993EP03322 | Priority number, date | EP19920203777 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: EP 92203777 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413681 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0675889 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675889 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/14, A61K31/55, C07D487/14, C07D491/14, C07D519/00, // (C07D495/14, 333:00, 249:00, 223:00),(C07D487/14, 249:00, 223:00, 209:00),(C07D491/14, 307:00, 249:00, 223:00),(C07D519/00, 495:00, 471:00) | [1995/41] | CPC: |
C07D487/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D495/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07D491/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/41] | Title | German: | ANTIALLERGISCH TRIAZOLO (PYRROLO, THIENO ODER FURANO) AZEPINDERIVATE | [1995/41] | English: | ANTIALLERGIC TRIAZOLO(PYRROLO, THIENO OR FURANO)AZEPINE DERIVATIVES | [1995/41] | French: | DERIVES D'AZEPINE TRIAZOLO(PYRROLO, THIENO OU FURANO) | [1995/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9206981 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [DA] 1,5 * claims 1,13 *; | [PA]EP0518434 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]) [PA] 1,5* page 27, line 2 - line 3; claim 1 * |