EP0626058 - ULTRA-HIGH PURITY MONOSILANE PRODUCING PROCESS AND UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAMURA, Takashi, Harima Factory of Teisan K.K. 16 Niijima Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
TOMITA, Shinji, Harima Factory of Teisan K.K. 16 Niijima Harima-cho Kako-gun, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan L'Air Liquide Service Brevets et Marques 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Mercey, Fiona Susan L'Air Liquide, Service Brevets et Marques, 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94901942.6 | 30.11.1993 | [1994/48] | WO1993EP03378 | Priority number, date | JP19920343536 | 01.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34353692 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412837 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626058 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626058 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/08, C01B33/04 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
C01B33/046 (EP,US);
Y10S62/931 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | VERFARHEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ULTRA-HOCHREINEM MONOSILANGAS | [1994/48] | English: | ULTRA-HIGH PURITY MONOSILANE PRODUCING PROCESS AND UNIT | [1994/48] | French: | UNITE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MONOSILANE DE TRES GRANDE PURETE | [1994/48] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6163514 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860807), vol. 10, no. 226, Database accession no. (C - 364), & JP61063514 A 19860401 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | Examination | - R M Thorogood, "Developments in air separation", Gas Separation & Purification, June 1991, Vol 5, pages 83 to 94 |