EP0674689 - MIDDLE PETROLEUM DISTILLATE COMPOSITION CONTAINING A PARAFFIN SETTLING SPEED LIMITER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | For all designated states Elf Antar France Tour Elf, Cedex 45 92078 Paris La Defense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
For all designated states ELF ANTAR FRANCE Tour Elf, Cedex 45 F-92078 Paris La Defense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASSILAKIS, Despina 293, rue Garibaldi F-69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
LEGER, Robert 33 bis, la Croix-Sainte-Agathe F-69440 Taluyers / FR | 03 /
FORESTIERE, Alain 1369, chemin du Pelet F-69390 Vernaison / FR | 04 /
GAILLARD, Jean 18, rue Alfred-Gueymard F-38400 Saint-Martin-d'Hères / FR | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Andreeff, François, et al INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE Patent Division 4 rue de la Paroisse 78400 Chatou / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/40] | Andreeff, François, et al INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois-Préau F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94902004.4 | 08.12.1993 | [1995/40] | WO1993FR01212 | Priority number, date | FR19920015358 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9215358 | [1995/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413758 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0674689 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0674689 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/22 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
C10L1/2222 (EP);
C10L1/22 (KR);
C10L1/143 (EP);
C10L1/221 (EP);
C10L1/224 (EP);
C10L1/238 (EP);
C10L1/2381 (EP);
C10L10/04 (EP);
C10L1/1608 (EP);
C10L1/1973 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/40] | Title | German: | EINES DIE SENKUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT VON PARAFFINEN BESCHRÄNKENDE MITTEL ENTHALTENDE ERDÖLMITTELDESTILLATEZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1995/40] | English: | MIDDLE PETROLEUM DISTILLATE COMPOSITION CONTAINING A PARAFFIN SETTLING SPEED LIMITER | [1995/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DISTILLAT MOYEN DE PETROLE RENFERMANT UN AGENT LIMITANT LA VITESSE DE SEDIMENTATION DES PARAFFINES | [1995/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/40] | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1999/16] | IE | 14.05.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2638450 (WHITE RALPH V, et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11 * column W *; | [A]FR1197418 (SOCONY MOBIL OIL CO INC) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US3068082 (PARIS WILLIAM W, et al) [Y] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]US3920698 (HAEMMERLE BERNARD, et al) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [Y]FR2490669 (ELF FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]EP0071513 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2539754 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2576032 (ELF FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0299119 (PETROLITE CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0353116 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * page 6, line 1 - line 22 * [Y] 8-10 | Examination | US2982630 | US3035907 | US3046102 | US3172853 | FR1416295 | GB1021183 | US3444082 | FR2018439 | FR2095403 | US3905781 | FR2354346 | US4144036 | US4234435 | EP0034968 | US4326987 | by applicant | US2638450 | EP0071513 |