EP0727964 - APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY HOLDING AND SEALING TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PREMIER LASER SYSTEMS, INC. 3 Morgan Irvine California 92718 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states PREMIER LASER SYSTEMS, INC. 3 Morgan Irvine, California 92718 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Dallas, W. 15 West Isle Place The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94902263.6 | 16.11.1993 | [1996/35] | WO1993US11094 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9513747 | Date: | 26.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0727964 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A61B18/22 (KR);
A61B17/00491 (KR);
A61B17/0487 (KR);
A61B2017/0488 (KR);
A61B2018/0063 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM GLEICHZEITIGEN HALTEN UND VERSCHLIESSEN VON GEWEBE | [1996/35] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SIMULTANEOUSLY HOLDING AND SEALING TISSUE | [1996/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE MAINTIEN ET DE SOUDURE SIMULTANES DE TISSUS | [1996/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 13.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0480293 (LASERSURGE INC [US]) [A] 1-12,14,16 * column 6, line 11 - line 27 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 4; figures 1,8 * * column 9, line 36 - line 47 *; | [A]US4597379 (KIHN HARRY [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,14,16 * column 4, line 19 - line 35; figures 1,8 *; | [E]WO9408526 (PROCLOSURE INC [US]) [E] 1-14,16 * page 8, line 2 - line 19 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 7; figure 2A * | International search | [X]WO9110404 (SLT JAPAN KK [JP]); | [X]SU1021035 (SKOBELKIN O K, et al); | [X]DE2550693 (STORZ KARL); | [A]US5217460 (KNOEPFLER DENNIS J [US]) |