EP0672264 - INJECTION MOLDED OPTICAL FERRULES AND APPARATUS AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, Melvin, Harry 21 Mountainview Trail Chadds Ford, PA 19317 / US | 02 /
WILLIS, Frank, Marsden 102 Lenape Trail, P.O.Box 224 Wenonah, NJ 08090 / US | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94902443.4 | 02.12.1993 | [1995/38] | WO1993US11525 | Priority number, date | US19920984796 | 03.12.1992 Original published format: US 984796 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412902 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0672264 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0672264 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/3865 (EP,US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
B29C45/14549 (EP,US);
B29C45/261 (EP,US);
B29C45/56 (EP,US);
B29D11/0075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | SPRITZGEGOSSENER OPTISCHER STECKERSTIFT SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1995/38] | English: | INJECTION MOLDED OPTICAL FERRULES AND APPARATUS AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [1995/38] | French: | FERRULES OPTIQUES MOULEES PAR INJECTION ET APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DESTINES A LEUR PREPARATION | [1995/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.1997 | BE | 28.05.1997 | CH | 28.05.1997 | DK | 28.05.1997 | ES | 28.05.1997 | LI | 28.05.1997 | IE | 02.12.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 28.05.1997 | |
BE | 28.05.1997 | ||
CH | 28.05.1997 | ||
DK | 28.05.1997 | ||
LI | 28.05.1997 | ||
IE | 02.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | AT | 28.05.1997 | |
BE | 28.05.1997 | ||
CH | 28.05.1997 | ||
DK | 28.05.1997 | ||
LI | 28.05.1997 | ||
FR | 24.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.05.1997 | |
BE | 28.05.1997 | ||
CH | 28.05.1997 | ||
DK | 28.05.1997 | ||
LI | 28.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 28.05.1997 | |
BE | 28.05.1997 | ||
CH | 28.05.1997 | ||
LI | 28.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 28.05.1997 | |
CH | 28.05.1997 | ||
LI | 28.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 28.05.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6125108 ; | [A]EP0048597 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1,22 * see abstract * * page 3, line 37 - page 5, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0064749 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [A] 1,22 * see abstract * * page 3, line 9 - line 31 ** figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860621), vol. 10, no. 177, Database accession no. (P - 470)<2233>, & JP61025108 A 19860204 (HITACHI) [A] 1,22 * abstract * | [XA] - I. SANKAWA ET AL., "Low-Loss Small-Size Optical-Fiber Connector With a Precision Plastic-Molded Ferrule", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., NEW YORK US, (198608), vol. LT-4, no. 8, pages 1237 - 1242 [X] 10 * see the whole document * [A] 16 | Examination | JPS6125108 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10no. 177 (P-470)(2233) 21 June 1986 & JP,A,61 025 108 |