EP0673323 - MULTILAYER GRAPHIC ARTICLE WITH COLOR LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Chia-Tie P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MACMULLEN, Carl, W. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SAWKA, Raymond, M. P.O.Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1995/39] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/39] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94902445.9 | 30.11.1993 | [1995/39] | WO1993US11530 | Priority number, date | US19920988759 | 10.12.1992 Original published format: US 988759 | [1995/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9413496 | Date: | 23.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0673323 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0673323 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B44C5/04, C09J123/08, C08K3/00, B44C1/17 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
G02B5/128 (EP,US);
B44C5/04 (KR);
B44C1/17 (EP,US);
B44C1/1716 (EP,US);
B44C5/0446 (EP,US);
B44F1/04 (EP,US);
C09J123/08 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
C08L2666/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1438 (EP,US);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J123/08, C08L2666/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/39] | Title | German: | FARBSCHICHT ENTHALTENDER MEHRSCHICHTIGER GRAPHISCHER ARTIKEL | [1995/39] | English: | MULTILAYER GRAPHIC ARTICLE WITH COLOR LAYER | [1995/39] | French: | ARTICLE MULTI-COUCHES A USAGE GRAPHIQUE COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE DE COULEUR | [1995/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/39] | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0274434 ; | [A]WO8501052 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-4,6 * page 2, line 3 - page 5, line 7; example 1 *; | [A]EP0266109 (REXHAM CORP [US]) [A] 1,4,8-10 * column 3, line 50 - column 8, line 44 *; | [A]WO9220534 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,4,6,8,9 * page 9, line 1 - page 13, line 18 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900606), vol. 14, no. 262, Database accession no. (M - 0981), & JP02074434 A 19900314 (SANKEI GIKEN KOGYO KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | Examination | JPH0274434 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14no. 262 (M-0981)6 June 1990 & JP,A,02 074 434 (SANKEI GIKEN KOGYO KK) 14 March 1990 s |