EP0731670 - PUPIL EXPANDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/38] | PUPIL EXPANDER AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | ||
[2000/37] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.08.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 17.10.2001 [2001/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graether, John M. 611 Elmwood Drive Marshalltown, IA 50158 / US | [1996/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 94902453.3 | 30.11.1993 | [1996/38] | WO1993US11552 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9515120 | Date: | 08.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0731670 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61F2/14 | [1996/38] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/38] | Title | German: | PUPILLENDEHNEINRICHTUNG | [2000/37] | English: | PUPIL EXPANDER | [2000/37] | French: | DILATATEUR DE PUPILLE | [2000/37] |
Former [1996/38] | PUPILLENDEHNEINRICHTUNG UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1996/38] | PUPIL EXPANDER AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | ||
Former [1996/38] | DILATATEUR DE PUPILLE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/38] | 30.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/42] | 25.05.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5163419 (GOLDMAN KENNETH N [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 45; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]US4782820 (WOODS RANDALL L [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [E]US5267553 (GRAETHER JOHN M [US]) [E] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1-3 * |